70TH PORTSMOUTH (1ST DRAYTON) SCOUTS GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scout Group. Youth Orgainisation for boys and girls. Our aim is to promote the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials, as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local, national and international communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 22 October 1965: Standard registration
- 70TH PORTSMOUTH (1ST DRAYTON) BOY SCOUTS GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUGH PEAD | Chair | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Astle | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Warfield | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy MacMull | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Lovett | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Mattingley | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Lewis | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Musson | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANN HUMPLEBY GSL | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG HUMPLEBY SL | Trustee | 09 July 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.54k | £25.66k | £23.41k | £29.00k | £26.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.37k | £11.36k | £13.36k | £30.00k | £25.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 April 2023 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 April 2023 | 453 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 April 2023 | 453 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 April 2023 | 818 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 10TH JANUARY, 1958
Charitable objects
BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
FARLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Silvertrees
EMSWORTH
Hampshire
PO10 7ST
- Phone:
- 07940575761
- Email:
- craighumpleby@googlemail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window