ROMSEY DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting Activities for young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 08 October 1963: Standard registration
- ROMSEY DISTRICT SCOUTS (Working name)
- ROMSEY BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Joanna Sutton | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Quentin Nicholas Saloway | Trustee | 29 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Hunt | Trustee | 29 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Black | Trustee | 29 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dave Shill | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Helen West | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT LINK | Trustee | 11 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN JOHN TAYLOR-MILTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Elizabeth Margaret Holloway | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID MICHAEL EDWARD SUTTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DARREN REED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.78k | £38.83k | £23.26k | £51.43k | £138.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.38k | £37.60k | £23.23k | £49.91k | £135.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £750 | £10.16k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 November 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER4TH JANUARY 1912, AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 28TH MARCH 1948, 18TH FEBRUARY 1959, 5TH MAY 1967 AND 19TH JULY 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVRELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL,INTELLECTUAL,SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
ROMSEY AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Dr Peter Centre
Baden Powell Way
Romsey
Hampshire
SO53 3GN
- Phone:
- 01794400141
- Email:
- claire@devondrive.org
- Website:
-
romseyscouts.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window