SOLENT SCOUT TRAINING CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
It provides a campsite, accommodation and facilities for scouts and other young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 10 August 1972: Standard registration
- LYONS COPSE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Mark Thompson | Chair | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carl Geoffrey PETTIT | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Catherin Thompson | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Freemantle | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARY ALISON FREEMANTLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOSEPH HARBOUR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL JOHN EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELAINE JEWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN EDWARD CRABB | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.11k | £38.35k | £62.48k | £68.47k | £68.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.49k | £39.84k | £43.71k | £62.38k | £70.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £18.71k | £2.20k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 19 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 22 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST 10TH FEBRUARY 1971
Charitable objects
BOATING AND TRAING CENTRE FOR MEMBERS OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
SOUTH-WEST HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lyons Copse
Sandy Lane
Shedfield
SOUTHAMPTON
SO32 2HQ
- Phone:
- 01489894950
- Email:
- lyons.copse@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.