14TH SOUTHAMPTON (HIGHFIELD) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities, training and fun for children aged 6-14
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Southampton City
Governance
- 09 August 1966: Standard registration
- 14TH SOUTHAMPTON BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Scholefield | Chair | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebecca Fay Bosson | Trustee | 21 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Elizabeth Lenz | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Morice Jeffery | Trustee | 31 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ben Peter Hiett | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.43k | £28.91k | £17.52k | £36.09k | £40.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.63k | £13.64k | £21.90k | £46.20k | £39.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 111 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT DATED 28TH APRIL 1966 ON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSABLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
HIGHFIELD,SOUTHAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 Brookvale Rd.
SOUTHAMPTON
- Phone:
- 07429042536
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window