9TH ITCHEN (WOOLSTON METHODIST) SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 08 October 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew William Franks | Chair | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Christopher Andrews | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Adam Franks | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Wright | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jane Smith | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel John Franks | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.68k | £22.88k | £51.82k | £13.93k | £20.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.10k | £10.10k | £45.30k | £20.21k | £28.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 May 2024 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 April 2023 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 April 2023 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28TH NOVEMBER 1961
Charitable objects
9TH ITCHEN (WOOLSTON METHODIST) SEA SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
SOUTHAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
286 MIDDLE ROAD
SOUTHAMPTON
SO19 8NX
- Phone:
- 07764168775
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window