19TH THORNHILL (ITCHEN NORTH DIVISION) - GROUP OF BOY SCOUTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of Scouting is to contribute to the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local, national and international communities. Some of the activities included camping, hiking, archery, cooking and many more fun activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Southampton City
Governance
- 15 January 1968: Standard registration
- 19TH ITCHEN NORTH SCOUT GROUP (ST CHRISTOPHERS) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashley Paul Warner | Chair | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
HARRY BUTLER | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROB HARFIELD | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Harfield | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Scout Association | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.96k | £21.02k | £3.39k | £5.98k | £6.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.45k | £9.52k | £10.51k | £21.05k | £8.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 January 2022 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20TH FEBRUARY, 1964
Charitable objects
BOY SCOUT GROUP (UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION)
Area of benefit
THORNHILL
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Holly Gardens, West End
Southampton
SO30 3RU
- Phone:
- 07365 131733
- Email:
- HARRYBUTLER5@ICLOUD.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window