SWAY GIRLGUIDING MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 302311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Girl Guiding UK. We support and help members both Brownie Guides & Girl Guides to enjoy & participate inall activites the movement has to offer. This may also support the leaders running units to obtain training which will benefit the girls.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £3,792
Total expenditure: £2,775

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 December 1971: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • 1ST SWAY GUIDE COMPANY (Previous name)
  • SWAY GIRL GUIDES COMPANY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JACQUELINE PAULSON Trustee 12 January 2017
None on record
Vivienne Joy Franklin Trustee 09 January 2017
None on record
Carole M Deacon Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £17.89k £11.43k £21.47k £3.78k £3.79k
Total expenditure £4.37k £971 £684 £17.35k £2.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 November 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 NEWBRIDGE DRIVE COTTAGES
MILFORD ROAD
EVERTON
LYMINGTON
SO41 0JF
Phone:
01590678986
Website:

No information available