Accounts and annual returns THE VILLAGE HALL BAYFORD

Charity Number: 302330
Charity reporting is up to date (24 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 01 March 2025 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 11 September 2024 219 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 28 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 22 February 2022 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 22 February 2022 382 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required