CHIPPERFIELD VILLAGE CLUBS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the purpose of village clubs for men and youths and for women and girls respectively, for persons resident in Chipperfield and the neighbourhood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 27 January 1964: Standard registration
- BLACKWELL'S- THE VILLAGE CLUB (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTONY THOMPSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Debra Joeanne Clayton | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Welling | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
KAREN ANGELA MELHUISH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTYN ERIC DICKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.00k | £6.25k | £7.50k | £15.00k | £16.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.83k | £5.55k | £1.71k | £8.24k | £12.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 4TH JULY 1939 AS VARIED BY SCHEME SEALED 22ND APRIL 1974
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF VILLAGE CLUBS FOR MEN AND YOUTHS AND FOR WOMEN AND GIRLS RESPECTIVELY, FOR THE BENEFIT, INCLUDING PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION, OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN CHIPPERFIELD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
CHIPPERFIELD AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hillside
Poles Hill
Sarratt
Herts
WD3 4NR
- Phone:
- 07714246602
- Email:
- lisawelling00@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window