DIGSWELL VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 302361
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Management of a village hall for community use.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £25,749
Total expenditure: £32,178

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 June 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DIGSWELL HALL (INCLUDING DIGSWELL GREEN) (Previous name)
  • DIGSWELL VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shaun Reason Chair 30 January 2023
None on record
O'Shea Paul Trustee 13 January 2025
None on record
O'Shea Diane Trustee 13 January 2025
None on record
David White Trustee 10 October 2023
None on record
Pamela Rendell Trustee 20 March 2023
MONK'S WALK SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Joanne Grant Trustee 23 June 2020
None on record
Claire Westlake Trustee 13 April 2016
None on record
KATE STABLER Trustee 26 March 2015
None on record
Peter Holt Trustee 13 May 2000
ST ALBANS AND WELWYN METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.25k £25.22k £25.69k £24.95k £25.75k
Total expenditure £27.46k £15.82k £15.04k £30.90k £32.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.24k £10.67k £5.00k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 16 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
30 Harmer Green Lane
Digswell
Welwyn
Hertfordshire
AL6 0AT
Phone:
07771974325