Financial history EASTWICK AND GILSTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 302368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2020 01/01/2021 01/01/2022 01/01/2023 01/01/2024
Total gross income £13.21k £13.21k £27.67k £8.92k £30.14k
Total expenditure £6.65k £6.65k £23.15k £31.59k £17.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £23.88k N/A £19.19k