EASTWICK AND GILSTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The hall exists for the benefit of the parish and is available for hire, with carpark at reduced rates for parishioners . It supports local initiatives and provides space for meetings and social activity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
Total income includes £19,189 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 20 September 1963: Standard registration
- GILSTON AND EASTWICK VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Mary Harvey | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janine Bryant | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Keith Harvey | Trustee | 10 March 2002 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR BROWN | Trustee | 01 September 1980 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.21k | £13.21k | £27.67k | £8.92k | £30.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.65k | £6.65k | £23.15k | £31.59k | £17.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £23.88k | N/A | £19.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 23 November 2022 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | 12 January 2023 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 23 November 2022 | 387 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 23 November 2022 | 752 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 03 OCT 1951
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF GILSTON AND EASTWICK AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINTY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Norbrook
Eastwick
HARLOW
Essex
CM20 2QX
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- gevillagehall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window