BREAKS MANOR YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Centre shall be to provide an informal programme of diverse, enjoyable and experiential learning opportunities for young people, designed to promote personal and social growth with academic and vocational achievement in the transition from childhood to adulthood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 27 January 1964: Standard registration
- BREAKS MANOR YOUTH CENTRE (Working name)
- HATFIELD YOUTH CENTRES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Howard Charles Taunton | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Wise | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandy Jones | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Mendez | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Peter Hebden | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
June Wendy Walters | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barry Clark | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY BASDEN | Trustee | 22 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
LINDA MENDEZ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR TONY CROWTHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.32k | £131.75k | £121.47k | £134.78k | £159.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.16k | £101.05k | £97.34k | £134.46k | £163.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS ADOPTED 13TH MAY, 1963
Charitable objects
YOUTH CLUBS
Area of benefit
HATFIELD AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
BREAKS MANOR
LINK DRIVE
HATFIELD
AL10 8TP
- Phone:
- 01707 263201
- Email:
- info@breaksmanor.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window