CHAULDEN NEIGHBOURHOOD ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bowling After School Club Bingo Martial Arts Dance Keep fit Coffee Morning Tiny Talk (Baby Sign) Suzuki Parent & Baby Music Group Deeper Life Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 09 April 1964: Standard registration
- CHAULDEN COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAWN SHUTE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Cty Cllr Terry Douris | Trustee | 18 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Carey | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.73k | £29.98k | £67.85k | £57.71k | £48.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.18k | £29.36k | £45.86k | £38.38k | £38.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.43k | £12.67k | £6.93k | £7.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 March 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 March 2023 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 March 2021 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 March 2021 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST APRIL 1957
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELL-BEING OF THE NEIGHBOURHOOD RESIDENTS IN THE AREA DESIGNATED AS CHAULDEN, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL, MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHAULDEN NEIGHBOURHOOD ASSOCIATION
CHAULDEN HALL
LONG CHAULDEN
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
HP1 2HX
- Phone:
- 01442242039
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window