Hoddesdon Boxing Academy

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Youth Club facilities for young people in the Borough of Broxbourne and the town of Hoddesdon
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 13 May 1963: Standard registration
- Hoddesdon Boxing Academy (Working name)
- THE HAILEYBURY CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Stetch | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
DENISE COE | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
KEITH COCKMAN OBE | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.89k | £28.76k | £22.92k | £41.05k | £19.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.91k | £21.75k | £35.19k | £43.75k | £14.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.90k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 March 2022 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 5TH MARCH 1954 as amended on 26 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF A BOYS' CLUB WITH THE OBJECTS OF PROMOTING THE MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL WELLBEING OF BOYS BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THEIR EDUCATION AND RECREATION.
Area of benefit
HODDESDON URBAN DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Robert Gilling Hall
91 Burford Street
HODDESDON
Hertfordshire
EN11 8HX
- Phone:
- 07957217356
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window