Trustees HUNSDON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 302408

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael James Carter | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jacaranda Carthy | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Ricketts | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Felstead | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kate Ma | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Barnett | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julian Maule | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frank O'Shea | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Newman | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mark Dunstan | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Slater | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Karen Osterley | Trustee | 11 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
DIANE DANGELL | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Liz Chapman | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA JUNE FELSTEAD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.