GRANGE FELLOWSHIP COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-school for rising 5's offering flexibility for parents who work. Social Groups for Over 60's Social Club for the local community Sponsorships/Donations for local non-profit organisations Providing a hall free of charge for Adults with learning difficulties and local groups Fundraising for other chairties, such as McMillan Nurses, Garden House Hospice
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 31 October 1961: Standard registration
- GFCA (Working name)
- GRANGE ESTATE FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dean Fullard | Chair | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Atkins | Trustee | 30 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
ROY KEEBLE | Trustee | 30 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Callum Atkins | Trustee | 30 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Cooper | Trustee | 30 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darren Campbell | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roy Boon | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Smith | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Terry Kitchener | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
GLENN MEALING | Trustee | 27 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gordon E Elliott | Trustee | 18 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
HILDA GREGORY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.07k | £464.20k | £257.17k | £466.43k | £519.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.11k | £499.85k | £332.80k | £533.81k | £610.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £87.69k | £108.86k | £96.31k | N/A |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3RD OCTOBER 1955, AS AMENDED 2ND JUNE 1958 AS FURTHER AMENDED 27TH FEBRUARY 1986. AS AMENDED ON 02 OCT 1997 AS AMENDED ON 18 OCT 2006 as amended on 19 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELL BEING OF THE COMMUNITY RESIDENT ON THE GRANGE ESTATE BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND RESIDENTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO FURTHER HEALTH, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION, AND SOCIAL, MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT, AND TO FOSTER A COMMUNITY SPIRIT FOR THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THESE AND OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
THE GRANGE ESTATE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Grange Community Centre
Middlefields
Letchworth Garden City
SG6 4NG
- Phone:
- 01462620505
- Email:
- gfca65@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window