Trustees VILLAGE HALL TRUST, LITTLE HADHAM
Charity number: 302425

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANETTE WILLIAMSON | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alice Dain | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gina Turnstill | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janine Peart | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Annette Luedtke | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter English | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN WESTLAKE | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH WHEELER | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Joan McKinlay | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Mardell | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Denise Armstrong | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.