NASH MILLS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 302433
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Maintenance and management of Nash Mills village hall. The hall is used by the greater community for social activities and gatherings. The hall is self funding and we receive no financial support for running costs from the Parish or local council.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £33,693
Total expenditure: £18,477

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 May 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Clark Trustee 18 October 2021
None on record
Richard Ball Trustee 18 October 2021
None on record
Nicola Cobb Trustee 19 June 2019
None on record
Janet Maddern Trustee 28 November 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £72.15k £47.40k £50.35k £29.73k £33.69k
Total expenditure £25.42k £38.61k £31.61k £15.37k £18.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.81k £10.67k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 February 2024 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 06 February 2024 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 04 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
29 Swan Mead
Hemel Hempstead
Hertfordshire
HP3 9DQ
Phone:
07711 066696