Accounts and annual returns NEWNHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 302434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2024 14 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2023 14 March 2025 195 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 01 October 2023 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 19 November 2022 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 15 March 2022 196 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required