RADWELL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 302449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Radwell Village Hall. This is a building in the village of Radwell,North Hertfordshire, which can be hired out for family or club functions and activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £5,020
Total expenditure: £4,858

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Bedford
  • Central Bedfordshire
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 May 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Antony John Woodman Chair 26 April 2021
None on record
valerie moles Trustee 01 May 2023
None on record
Kit Whiting Trustee 26 April 2021
None on record
CORRINE LINDA BUTT Trustee 17 May 2011
None on record
PHYLIS SHERDEL Trustee 17 May 2011
None on record
RICHARD MEREDITH-HARDY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.95k £20.06k £12.70k £2.14k £5.02k
Total expenditure £2.98k £10.66k £2.70k £8.17k £4.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.34k £10.67k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Still House
Radwell
BALDOCK
SG7 5ES
Phone:
01462730438
Website:

No information available