THE SANDRIDGE YOUTH AND SPORTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain the Spencer Hall building it's contents and facilities for use by Sandridge Cricket Club, Sandridge Rovers Football Club, Sandridge Youth Club and the local community. Regular hirers include an after school and holiday club, a line dance class, and a children's music class. The hall holds approximately 120 people seated and is available for hire for weddings, parties etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 07 March 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zara Cahill | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Davis | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Harris | Trustee | 25 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Camm | Trustee | 22 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
KIM NGUYEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.96k | £25.97k | £24.28k | £16.34k | £16.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.95k | £10.81k | £29.49k | £15.09k | £33.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.00k | £20.81k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5TH JANUARY 1967
Charitable objects
A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF SANDRIDGE ST. ALBANS AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 House Lane
Sandridge
ST. ALBANS
Hertfordshire
AL4 9ET
- Phone:
- 07752642788
- Email:
- jackyd0308@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window