SARRATT VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hire of Village Hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 17 January 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Haynes | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Jonatan Holmes | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Baker | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Gell | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Creed | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Groom | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Haynes | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Poulton | Trustee | 06 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA FERN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWARD NORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAWN PITTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN LESLIE PLUMMER BEM | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROGER DUDLEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
LARRY GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL WARNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL CHORLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.27k | £59.71k | £23.51k | £65.43k | £65.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.46k | £29.15k | £23.43k | £43.34k | £49.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £30.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 15 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 15 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 August 2022 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 August 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 13 August 2021 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 19 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 19 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7TH JUNE 1957 AND SECRETARY OF STATE FOR EDUCATION AND SCIENCE SCHEME 18TH NOVEMBER 1964
Charitable objects
A CENTRE FOR THE SOCIAL LIFE OF THE VILLAGE AND ITS VICINITY AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF PHYSICAL, SOCIAL AND INTELLECTUAL RECREATION AND ENTERTAINMENT AND OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT AND BENEFICIAL TO THE INHABITANTS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
VILLAGE OF SARRATT AND ITS VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sarratt Village Hall Management Committee
The Village Hall
The Green
Sarratt
RICKMANSWORTH
Hertford
- Phone:
- 01923263123
- Email:
- colin.plummer@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
sarrattvillagehall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window