SAWBRIDGEWORTH YOUNG PEOPLE'S RECREATIONAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Centre for hire to organisations for the benefit of young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £6,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 07 January 1970: Standard registration
- THE BULLFIELDS CENTRE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sawbridgeworth Town Council | Trustee | 14 August 1969 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.61k | £43.52k | £72.03k | £52.36k | £28.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.72k | £38.27k | £27.09k | £42.77k | £54.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.05k | £22.00k | £44.67k | £15.49k | £6.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2024 | 200 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2024 | 200 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 25TH NOVEMBER 1969
Charitable objects
RECREATION GROUND OR PLAYING FIELD FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS OF EITHER SEX RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF SEVENTEEN YEARS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
URBAN DISTRICT OF SAWBRIDGEWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sawbridgeworth Town Council
Sayesbury Manor
Bell Street
SAWBRIDGEWORTH
CM21 9AN
- Phone:
- 01279724537
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window