Financial history WALSWORTH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 302485
Charity reporting is up to date (61 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £25.35k £27.67k £16.02k £25.72k £25.56k
Total expenditure £20.72k £12.15k £19.43k £27.66k £24.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £8.00k N/A N/A