WATFORD SOCIAL CENTRE FOR THE BLIND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides a club where visually impaired people may meet socially enjoying weekly activities, entertainment & support specifically for those with sight loss. Regular days out and an annual holiday for members can be enjoyed. The club is open every week for two days & runs entirely on a self funded and voluntary basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 14 June 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jenny Marsh | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Edward Marsh | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Rayner | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Michael Brunton | Trustee | 17 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Radcliffe | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Gilthorpe | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Diane Abbott | Trustee | 21 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Dumbleton | Trustee | 31 October 2011 |
|
|||||
HILDA MATHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD TOWNLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.60k | £23.32k | £24.41k | £44.57k | £77.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.48k | £17.84k | £24.68k | £26.93k | £38.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 05/04/1951.
Charitable objects
A PLACE WHERE BLIND PEOPLE MAY MEET FOR SOCIAL INTERCOURSE ENTERTAINMENT AND EDUCATION TO PLY CRAFTS PECULIAR TO BLIND PEOPLE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF ENABLING BLIND PEOPLE TO ENTER INTO INDUSTRY AND THE PROFESSIONS AND TO BECOME AS FAR AS POSSIBLE SELF SUPPORTING.
Area of benefit
WATFORD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rene Milton Hall
17 Cross Street
Watford
Herts
WD17 2QD
- Phone:
- 07932746181
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window