Governing document GOSLING SPORTS PARK

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/02/1969 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/09/1978 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/04/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/10/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/09/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/10/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/10/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR TO ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR RECREATION PHYSICAL EDUCATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN OR IN CONNECTION WITH WELWYN GARDEN CITY AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION)
Area of benefit
WELWYN GARDEN CITY AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.