WESTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of a village hall in Weston, Hertfordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 04 November 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Kenneth Smithard | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angie Marie Brett | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Eleanor Fishwick | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nora Sashalmi | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Leslie Watson Hartfield | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michele Moody | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Perkins | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Briggs | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lucas | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM ROSS WHEATLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.63k | £22.03k | £9.41k | £13.19k | £27.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.29k | £11.69k | £6.97k | £9.25k | £19.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.50k | £20.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 February 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 18TH APRIL 1983 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 24TH SEPTEMBER 1999 AND BY RESOLUTION DATED 05 NOVEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WESYTON.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WESTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rosemary Cottage
Fore Street
Weston
HITCHIN
Hertfordshire
SG4 7AS
- Phone:
- 01462790394
- Email:
- charity@wvh.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window