3RD HATFIELD AIR SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cub scouting activities in accordance with National, County and District directives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 06 October 1964: Standard registration
- 3RD HATFIELD AIR SCOUTS (Working name)
- 3RD HATFIELD BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Willow Humphreys | Chair | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan ODriscoll | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simone Roberts | Trustee | 16 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.53k | £7.76k | £10.07k | £14.39k | £20.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.01k | £4.35k | £9.78k | £13.42k | £12.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 January 2024 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 January 2024 | 457 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 07 February 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT DATED 5TH MARCH 1964 UPON THE RUSTS O THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
3RD HATFIELD BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
HATFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Woods Avenue
HATFIELD
Hertfordshire
AL10 8NA
- Phone:
- 07711823787
- Email:
- team@3rdhatfield.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window