1ST HEMEL HEMPSTEAD SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly Scouting Activities throughout the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 09 August 1966: Standard registration
- 1ST HEMEL HEMPSTEAD BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Gilden | Chair | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Balazs Hegedus | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Willson | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Natalie Willis | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsteen Wilkes | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.77k | £27.17k | £23.78k | £17.90k | £16.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.69k | £11.77k | £12.00k | £39.73k | £18.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.81k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT DATED 30TH NOVEMBER 1965 ON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUT ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED DATED 1955.
Charitable objects
1ST HEMEL HEMPSTEAD BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Hemel Hempstead Scout Group
Queensway
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
Hertfordshire
HP2 5DF
- Phone:
- 01442263837
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window