HERTFORD DISTRICT GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Girlguiding is dedicated to creating a better world for girls and young women. We empower girls, we give them space to grow and we ensure hat each one of them can get involved - no matter what their background or ability. Hertford District Guide Association, also known as Girlguiding Hertford District provides local Girlguiding activities in Hertford and local villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 16 December 1966: Standard registration
- "GIRLGUIDING HERTFORD" PART OF "GIRLGUIDING UK" (Working name)
- Girlguiding Hertford District (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clare Curley | Chair | 18 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katrina May Goodair | Trustee | 07 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daphne Hynds | Trustee | 30 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Sian Morgan | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Mary Maguire | Trustee | 11 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.69k | £1.54k | £1.86k | £5.04k | £6.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.41k | £5.87k | £3.86k | £5.75k | £9.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26TH SEPTEMBER 1966
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF GIRLS OF ALL AGES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
HERTFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o 1 Ross Way
Slip End
LUTON
LU1 4DD
- Phone:
- 07854 545354
- Email:
- clarecurley21@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window