1ST KINGS LANGLEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PURPOSE OF SCOUTING IS TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES. THIS IS ACHIEVED THROUGH STRUCTURED TRAINING IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POLICY, ORGANISATION AND RULES OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 08 January 1963: Standard registration
- 09 October 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 20 February 2013: Re-registered
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN JOHNSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Phil McLachlan | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Harding | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
George Sylvester | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ALLEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.85k | £29.06k | £19.35k | £28.24k | £33.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.51k | £19.54k | £21.09k | £26.06k | £28.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 30TH AUGUST 1956
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF THE 1ST KINGS LANGLEY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
KING'S LANGLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
75 HEMPSTEAD ROAD
KINGS LANGLEY
WD4 8BS
- Phone:
- 07885400104
- Email:
- gsl@hemel-scouts.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window