ST ALBANS DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting activities for young people from age 4 in St Albans District.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 25 March 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kirstin Knight | Chair | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Moylett | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Connor Jackson | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luke Oliver James Ambrose | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Gavin Bray | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
VINCENT JOHN MOLLOY | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|||||
NICOLA WELLS | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr ANNETTE PAYNE | Trustee | 10 May 2015 |
|
|||||
LUCY HUNT | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN LINDSAY | Trustee | 30 April 2009 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £249.75k | £50.98k | £157.22k | £286.65k | £262.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.32k | £126.52k | £165.42k | £270.57k | £252.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 10TH JANUARY 1947 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1935
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF THE ST. ALBANS SCOUTS ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
ST. ALBANS
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Rowlatt Drive
ST. ALBANS
AL3 4NB
- Phone:
- 01727830818
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window