STEVENAGE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of scouting and the Dsitrict of Stevenage is to promote the development of youn people in achieving their full physical, intellectual and spiritual potentials as individuals and as members of their local,national and international communities. This is achieved by providing an enjoyable and attractive scheme of progressive training based on the Scout Promise and guided by adult leadership
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 13 February 1964: Standard registration
- STEVENAGE BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Smith | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Tina Anne Brown | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Jermy | Trustee | 15 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET NOTLEY | Trustee | 15 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Maureen Nicholson | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Dutt | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marie Oakshott | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Hall | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Skittrall | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Arthur Edwards | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Shackell | Trustee | 28 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
P A PHIPPS | Trustee | 28 July 1994 |
|
|
||||
Roy NICHOLSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.00k | £72.57k | £58.98k | £77.84k | £65.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.34k | £36.49k | £51.70k | £70.66k | £96.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £50.48k | £16.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 February 2025 | 378 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 February 2025 | 391 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 March 2021 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT DATED 10TH JULY 1961 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
STEVENAGE BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
STEVENAGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
118 HYDEAN WAY
STEVENAGE
SG2 9XP
- Phone:
- 01438747929
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window