1ST WELWYN SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing scouting activities to young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 23 May 1967: Standard registration
- 1ST WELWYN BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Herbert Trotter | Chair | 04 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Leon Stoner | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Worsley | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Worsley | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Joseph Gray | Trustee | 20 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.42k | £26.19k | £31.29k | £43.60k | £47.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.16k | £13.29k | £25.79k | £30.57k | £32.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHEIVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL,INTELLECTUAL SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS,AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL,NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
WELWYN
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Kindersley Close
WELWYN
AL6 9RN
- Phone:
- 07768055443
- Email:
- hockadaym@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window