Financial history 6TH WELWYN GARDEN CITY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302604
Charity reporting is up to date (76 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.50k £15.91k £48.27k £5.98k £12.32k
Total expenditure £12.90k £12.99k £8.14k £9.84k £13.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.33k £41.29k N/A N/A