HEMINGFORD PEACE MEMORIAL FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of sports facilities and social facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £3,250 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 01 October 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Michael Robert Dampney | Chair | 20 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Max Wray | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA JOAN PEEK | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Richard Speer | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER WILLIAM YOUNG | Trustee | 22 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.61k | £86.58k | £55.34k | £63.73k | £77.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.66k | £117.64k | £80.79k | £65.28k | £68.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £53.06k | £7.00k | £3.13k | £3.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 April 2020
(These accounts |
20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 18TH DECEMBER 1964
Charitable objects
PLAYING FIELD AND PUBLIC RECREATION GROUND.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF HEMINGFORD GREY AND HEMINGFORD ABBOTTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hemingford Pavilion
Manor Road
Hemingford Grey
HUNTINGDON
Cambridgeshire
PE28 9BX
- Phone:
- 01480464490
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window