THE HILTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE TO MANAGE THE AFFAIRS OF THE HALL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £2,100 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 22 July 1963: Standard registration
- HILTON VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Webster | Chair | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANET TAYLOR | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
BRIDGET HAVARD | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Attwood | Trustee | 18 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Conn | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.91k | £23.93k | £22.42k | £15.89k | £22.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.79k | £6.83k | £5.31k | £13.49k | £23.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.33k | £17.37k | £3.17k | £2.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11TH APRIL 1963. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 1ST OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF HILTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Area of benefit
HILTON, CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Village Hall
Grove End
Hilton
HUNTINGDON
Cambridgeshire
PE28 9PF
- Phone:
- 07752678415
- Email:
- Info@hiltonvillagehall.com
- Website:
-
Hiltonvillagehall.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window