MAXEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running upkeep and maintenance of Maxey Village Hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 11 September 1972: Standard registration
- MAXEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- MAXEY VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth-Anne Lonsdale | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Pike | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Vito Ronzano | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Yarham | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN BAGWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.77k | £36.67k | £14.62k | £20.33k | £22.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.32k | £7.97k | £23.04k | £19.93k | £28.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.00k | £29.60k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 14 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 14 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 15 MAY 1972 AND CONSTITUTION DATED 30TH JULY 1990. as amended on 11 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MAXEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Maxey Community Association
School Lane
Maxey
PETERBOROUGH
PE6 9EL
- Phone:
- 07885135448
- Email:
- maxeyvillagehall@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window