Trustees OLD WESTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 302654
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julia Pearson Chair 07 March 2019
None on record
Charles Leitch Trustee 20 February 2023
None on record
Magda Patrick Trustee 15 March 2022
None on record
Charles Hallam Trustee 15 March 2022
None on record
Joseph Jackson Trustee 15 March 2022
None on record
Paul Patrick Trustee 15 March 2022
None on record
Kizzy Hazelwood Trustee 03 August 2020
None on record
Matthew Stenson Trustee 07 March 2019
None on record
Rebecca Aston Trustee 30 June 2015
None on record
Felicity Brennan Trustee 30 May 2015
None on record