Financial history THE REYNOLDS PLAYING FIELD

Charity Number: 302669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.34k £1.30k £1.31k £1.53k £404
Total expenditure £661 £1.86k £1.32k £0 £8.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A