Trustees ASH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 302671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TONY JONES Chair 29 March 2010
None on record
Sarah Stephenson Trustee 09 October 2023
None on record
Rev Michael Alan Morris Trustee 28 March 2022
None on record
Gary Keith Bradbury Trustee 28 March 2022
None on record
Davina Jane Andrews Trustee 11 April 2016
None on record
Chris Burnside Trustee 11 January 2016
FRIENDS OF ST. NICHOLAS CHURCH ASH
Received: On time
DR DAVID GREAVES Trustee 13 October 2014
None on record
Matt Titterton Trustee 13 October 2014
None on record
LORRAINE MARGARET LAYTON Trustee 11 July 2011
None on record
HAZEL HOWARD Trustee 29 March 2004
FRIENDS OF ST. NICHOLAS CHURCH ASH
Received: On time
BRIAN JOHN LAST Trustee 15 April 2002
None on record