Trustees THE ASHURST MCDERMOTT HALL
Charity number: 302673

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Robert Wilkinson | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Edward Winder | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Whiston | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger Michael Colin Carden | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Wilhelm Friedrich Soyke | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Edward Galloway Riddick | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Chloe Archard | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carl Field Baxter | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Domenico Tarricone | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Lucinda Tysoe | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
SOPHIE MARGARET MINOPRIO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIA SOYKE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.