AYLESFORD COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of the inhabitants of Aylesford Parish without distinction of sex or of political religious ethnic or other opinions by the advancement of education and the provision of facilities in the interests of social welfare and in particular for use for recreation and leisure-time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 13 September 1971: Standard registration
- AYLESFORD VILLAGE COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bettina Barber | Chair | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Williams | Trustee | 26 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luke Chapman | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|||||
David Barber | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Fuller | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Keree-Bartolo | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Hobson | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julia Tompkins | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carole Difford | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.95k | £36.34k | £69.75k | £71.71k | £78.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.88k | £36.68k | £65.74k | £74.09k | £80.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.19k | £18.88k | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 20TH MAY 1971 AS AMENDED 6 APRIL 2009.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF AYLESFORD PARISH WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS ETHNIC OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF AYLESFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Aylesford Community Centre
25 Forstal Road
AYLESFORD
ME20 7AU
- Phone:
- 01622 717473
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window