VILLAGE HALL BARMING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hiring of Hall to various community groups for recreational and educational purposes, serving the needs of the people of Barming and district.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 18 November 1963: Standard registration
- BARMING VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ronald Edwin Mudie | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev William Walter North | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Goldsmith | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.29k | £15.49k | £13.57k | £12.85k | £9.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.91k | £6.03k | £14.51k | £10.22k | £8.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £350 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14TH NOVEMBER 1961
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHAMBITANTS OF BARMING AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Area of benefit
BARMING AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Rectory
Church Lane
Barming
MAIDSTONE
ME16 9HA
- Phone:
- 01622726263
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window