Accounts and annual returns VILLAGE HALL BOROUGH GREEN

Charity number: 302687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 27 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window