Financial history VILLAGE HALL BOROUGH GREEN

Charity number: 302687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £39.30k £32.36k £48.68k £40.57k £38.79k
Total expenditure £37.96k £33.43k £34.58k £32.10k £44.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.60k £16.86k N/A N/A