VILLAGE HALL BOROUGH GREEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of facilities for recreational purposes, such as a) local dramatic groups, b) local keep fit organisations, c) indoor sports activities such as badminton d) local young persons club meeting facilities and e) various discussion groups: the above come from the local surrounding areas in the immediate area of Borough Green.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 01 June 1965: Standard registration
- BOROUGH GREEN VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bryan Edward Rawlins | Chair | 22 July 2024 |
|
|||||
David Peirce | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Peirce | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.30k | £32.36k | £48.68k | £40.57k | £38.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.96k | £33.43k | £34.58k | £32.10k | £44.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.60k | £16.86k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20TH NOVEMBER 1964 as amended on 22 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH GREEN AND IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
High Street
Borough Green
SEVENOAKS
Kent
TN15 8BJ
- Phone:
- 01732 646040
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window