BREDHURST VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village hall is hired out to villagers and non-villagers and is used by a number of community organisations and clubs as well being used for celebratory parties, etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 11 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR T GOUGH | Chair | 18 April 2006 |
|
|
||||
Gary Foord | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
VANESSA JONES | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Naomi Fifield | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Norman Calver | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.08k | £29.35k | £21.14k | £34.42k | £34.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.28k | £28.29k | £22.58k | £28.00k | £27.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £18.10k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 March 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 March 2024 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 March 2024 | 421 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 March 2024 | 421 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2022 | 326 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 July 2021 | 176 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2022 | 690 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT DATED 30TH MAY 1962
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF BREDHURST AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
BREDHURST AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bredhurst Village Hall
Hurstwood Road
Bredhurst
ME7 3JZ
- Phone:
- 01634540095
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window