Accounts and annual returns BLUE BELL HILL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 302700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 May 2024 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 February 2023 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 February 2022 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required